House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2015
|
Special Act 15-18
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
File Number 823
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 503
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7062
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
File Number 224
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
House Calendar Number 155
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|