House
|
05/22/2015
|
File Number 887
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 583
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7285
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 277
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
House Calendar Number 173
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|