House
|
06/02/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
File Number 789
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 471
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6819
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
File Number 226
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
House Calendar Number 157
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|