House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-154
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 557
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
File Number 802
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
House Calendar Number 540
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|