House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 578 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 368 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |