House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 631
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8740
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8062
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 674
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
House Calendar Number 436
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|