House | 04/30/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | File Number 648 | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | House Calendar Number 407 | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |