House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2015
|
Public Act 15-79
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
File Number 870
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 562
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7547
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7553
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
File Number 405
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 263
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/09
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|