House
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-117
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
File Number 790
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 465
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6768
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
File Number 105
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
House Calendar Number 81
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|