House
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-136
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
File Number 792
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 467
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6346
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 279
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
House Calendar Number 175
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|