House | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 547 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 462 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 291 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |