House
|
07/06/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-207
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
File Number 831
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 517
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7100
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
File Number 359
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
House Calendar Number 216
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|