House
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-156
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
File Number 889
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 585
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7949
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 675
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
House Calendar Number 438
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|