House | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Special Act 15-4 | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 488 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 463 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 292 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |