House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-157
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
File Number 824
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 500
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6686
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 464
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
House Calendar Number 293
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|