House | 03/31/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | File Number 168 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 111 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 |