House | 04/14/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | No New File by Committee on Housing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Housing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | File Number 169 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 112 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |