House | 05/18/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 536 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | File Number 202 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | House Calendar Number 136 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
House | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |