House
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-119
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 466
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
House Calendar Number 295
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|