House | 05/22/2015 | File Number 879 | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 582 | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7813 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 407 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 265 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |