House | 04/01/2015 | File Number 363 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | House Calendar Number 220 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |