House | 05/07/2015 | File Number 768 | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 315 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 197 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |