House | 06/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Public Act 15-120 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 509 | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | File Number 76 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | House Calendar Number 72 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |