House | 06/04/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Public Act 15-19 | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 460 | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | File Number 179 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 115 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |