House | 03/25/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |