Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
File Number 917
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 623
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8498
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
File Number 180
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
House Calendar Number 116
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|