House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Public Act 15-51
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 720
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 384
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6234
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
File Number 39
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
House Calendar Number 59
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|