House
|
07/06/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-208
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
File Number 784
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 452
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6790
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
File Number 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
House Calendar Number 49
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|