House
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-121
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
File Number 832
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 520
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6202
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
File Number 116
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
House Calendar Number 92
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|