House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-160
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 535
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
File Number 79
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
House Calendar Number 75
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|