House | 03/31/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | File Number 80 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | House Calendar Number 76 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |