House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Public Act 15-52
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
File Number 833
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 519
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7112
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
File Number 230
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
House Calendar Number 161
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|