Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-122
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 605
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 6596
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House Designated House Amendment Schedule B 6596
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8239
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
File Number 409
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 267
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|