House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2015
|
Public Act 15-80
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 563
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
File Number 817
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Calendar Number 545
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|