House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 410 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 268 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |