Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
File Number 899
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 601
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7855
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
File Number 318
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
House Calendar Number 200
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|