House | 06/02/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 650 | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7934 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | File Number 56 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | House Calendar Number 65 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |