Senate | 06/30/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Special Act 15-14 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 620 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | File Number 57 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | House Calendar Number 66 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |