Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06746 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/10/2015

                            General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6746
January Session, 2015  LCO No. 3390
 *_____HB06746GAE___030215____*
Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS
Introduced by:
(GAE)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 6746 

January Session, 2015

LCO No. 3390

*_____HB06746GAE___030215____*

Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS 

Introduced by:

(GAE)

AN ACT EXTENDING THE TERMS OF CERTAIN MEMBERS OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION COMMISSION. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 1-205 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):

(a) There shall be established, within the Office of Governmental Accountability established under section 1-300, a Freedom of Information Commission consisting of nine members. (1) Five of such members shall be appointed by the Governor, with the advice and consent of either house of the General Assembly. Such members shall serve for terms of four years from July first of the year of their appointment, except that of the members appointed prior to and serving on July 1, 1977, one shall serve for a period of six years from July 1, 1975, one shall serve for a period of four years from July 1, 1975, and one shall serve for a period of six years from July 1, 1977. Of the two new members first appointed by the Governor after July 1, 1977, one shall serve from the date of such appointment until June 30, 1980, and one shall serve from the date of such appointment until June 30, 1982. (2) On and after July 1, 2011, four members of the commission shall be appointed as follows: One by the president pro tempore of the Senate, one by the minority leader of the Senate, one by the speaker of the House of Representatives and one by the minority leader of the House of Representatives. Such members shall serve for terms of [two] four years from July first of the year of their appointment. (3) No more than five members of the commission shall be members of the same political party. Any vacancy in the membership of the commission shall be filled by the appointing authority for the unexpired portion of the term.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 from passage 1-205(a)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

from passage

1-205(a)

 

GAE Joint Favorable

GAE

Joint Favorable