House | 06/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Public Act 15-123 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7927 | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 468 | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | File Number 281 | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | House Calendar Number 177 | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |