Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-164
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
File Number 919
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 619
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8499
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
File Number 760
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 676
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
House Calendar Number 437
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|