House | 05/12/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | File Number 23 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | House Calendar Number 50 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |