House | 04/14/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | File Number 282 | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | House Calendar Number 178 | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |