House | 05/22/2015 | File Number 880 | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 580 | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6254 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | File Number 231 | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | House Calendar Number 162 | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |