House | 05/14/2015 | File Number 818 | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | File Number 24 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | House Calendar Number 51 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |