House | 03/24/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | File Number 58 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | House Calendar Number 67 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |