House
|
05/22/2015
|
File Number 881
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 574
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6794
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
File Number 411
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 269
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|