Senate | 05/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 608 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | File Number 908 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6002 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | File Number 171 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 118 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |