House | 03/23/2015 | File Number 172 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 119 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |