House
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Public Act 15-98
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
File Number 849
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 544
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6847
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
File Number 176
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
House Calendar Number 122
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|